Aultman et al v. St Francis Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Stacey Aultman and Heather Aultman
Defendant: Vijay Maggio, Amanda Schaefer, St Francis Medical Center, Walter Sartor and Biotronic National L L C
Case Number: 3:2016cv01133
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING - Diversity jurisdiction is established. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove William Sartor's name from the docket sheet since it was included in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/26/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 25, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/25/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 10, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 24 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 11 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims against St. Francis Medical Center are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' claims against all other defendants remain pending. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/10/17. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aultman et al v. St Francis Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Aultman
Represented By: Oscar L Shoenfelt, III
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Aultman
Represented By: Oscar L Shoenfelt, III
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vijay Maggio
Represented By: Monica A Frois
Represented By: Amy Lee McIntire
Represented By: Peter J Rotolo, III
Represented By: Ashley Miller Scott
Represented By: Brent A Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Schaefer
Represented By: Monica A Frois
Represented By: Amy Lee McIntire
Represented By: Peter J Rotolo, III
Represented By: Ashley Miller Scott
Represented By: Brent A Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Francis Medical Center
Represented By: Joseph John Cefalu, III
Represented By: Thomas Richard Temple, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Sartor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biotronic National L L C
Represented By: Monica A Frois
Represented By: Amy Lee McIntire
Represented By: Peter J Rotolo, III
Represented By: Ashley Miller Scott
Represented By: Brent A Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?