Mathis v. Richland Parish et al
Plaintiff: Mathis and Kevin Mathis
Defendant: Richland Parish, Sheriffs Dept Richland Parish, Joel Weatherly, Ricky Scott, J T Searcey, Nursing Staff Richland Parish Detention Center, Candy, Jamie, Cora, Ms Stampleton, Erica, Deputy Duschene and Sgt John S
Case Number: 3:2017cv00516
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Filing 14 JUDGMENT ADOPTING #13 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Joel Wetherly, Ricky Scott, J T Searcey, and Sgt John S, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/13/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 18, 2017 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Kevin Mathis, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's claims against remaining defendants be DISMISSED, with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/18/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS for failure to respond to #10 Order to Provide Summons as instructed. The court intends to dismiss any remaining defendant for whom plaintiff has failed to complete and return to the Clerk of Court the requisite service documents after 9/20/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Order dated July 26, 2017)(crt,Crawford, A)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT ADOPTING #9 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Dismissing Plaintiff's claims regarding destruction of his property, and against Deputy Duschene, With Prejudice as frivolous. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against the RPDC Nursing Staff, Jamie, Candy, Cora, Erica and Ms. Stampleton AND the Richland Parish Sheriffs Department be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Plaintiff's other claims remain pending at this time. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/5/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for each defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Clerk manually noticed order with forms. Pro Se Response due by 8/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Blank Summons Forms, #2 Blank USM 285 Forms)(crt,Crawford, A)
July 26, 2017 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Kevin Mathis, recommending that plaintiff's claims regarding destruction of his property, and against Deputy Duschene, be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that all claims against the RPDC Nursing Staff and the Richland Parish Sheriff's Department be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/26/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/12/2017. (crt,Williams, L)
May 11, 2017 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,HaikSld, K)
May 8, 2017 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ricky Scott, J T Searcey, Joel Weatherly, Duschene, John S filed by Kevin Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,HaikSld, K)
May 8, 2017 Filing 5 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts Officer page filed by Kevin Mathis regarding #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,HaikSld, K)
April 21, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Mathis. No accounts officer page. Clerk resent page with a note stating it must be completed. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to remove deficiency on 5/11/2017 (HaikSld, K).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(crt,HaikSld, K)
April 13, 2017 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2017 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Candy, Cora, Erica, Jamie, Sheriffs Dept Richland Parish, Nursing Staff Richland Parish Detention Center, Ricky Scott, J T Searcey, Stampleton, Joel Weatherly filed by Kevin Mathis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Richland Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept Richland Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J T Searcey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff Richland Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Stampleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Duschene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt John S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?