McDonald v. Nationwide Building Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Margaret McDonald
Defendant: Nationwide Building Services Inc, Brookshire Grocery Co and Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut
Case Number: 3:2017cv00981
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM RULING re 82 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Argel Building Services Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/18/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JUDGMENT adopting 84 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge granting 73 Motion to Dismiss as to United Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/10/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM RULING re 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut, Brookshire Grocery Co. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/7/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM RULING re 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Nationwide Building Services Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/5/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by Nationwide Building Services Inc. Within the next seven days from the date of this order, removing defendant is granted leave to file an amended notice of removal that establishes the citizenship of the parti es for purposes of diversity. If defendant fails to comply or if the subject matter jurisdiction is found to be lacking, the matter will be remanded to state court. Within the next 14 days from the date of this order, removing defendant shall file a memorandum, together with supporting evidence, sufficient to establish that the requisite jurisdictional amount was in controversy at the time of removal. Plaintiff may submit a response (and evidence) within seven days thereafter. If defendant fails to comply or the subject matter jurisdiction is found to be lacking, the matter will be remanded to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/20/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Nationwide Building Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret McDonald
Represented By: Chris L Bowman
Represented By: Steven Michael Gatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Building Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew Allen Ehrlicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Co
Represented By: David H Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Co of Connecticut
Represented By: David H Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?