Jarnevich v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mickie Jarnevich
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01117
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 12/10/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Mickie Jarnevich on U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA served on 9/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (aty,Rankin, Alex) Modified to include service date and answer due date on 9/18/2018 (Bunting, M).
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Leday, A)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/30/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
August 29, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Mickie Jarnevich. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Rankin, Alex)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mickie Jarnevich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Alex W Rankin added to party Mickie Jarnevich(pty:pla))(aty,Rankin, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarnevich v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickie Jarnevich
Represented By: Alex W Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?