Duke v. Momah

Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Duke
Defendant: Tobe Momah and USA
Case Number: 3:2018cv01165
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by USA . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Vincent, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/10/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
September 6, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
September 6, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed under La. Long-Arm statute with Tobe Momah answer due 9/13/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Ouachita Parish, Case Number 18-908 (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by Tobe Momah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Katherine W Vincent added to party Tobe Momah(pty:dft))(aty,Vincent, Katherine) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/7/2018 to remove print buttons on the Civil Cover Sheet.) (Mitchell, Pam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke v. Momah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Duke
Represented By: Richard L Fewell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobe Momah
Represented By: Katherine W Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Katherine W Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?