Britton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Teresa P. Britton and Teresa P Britton
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01523
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Teresa P Britton. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 12/4/2018, answer due 3/4/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Rankin, Alex)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Leday, A)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/27/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
November 21, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Teresa P. Britton re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (aty,Rankin, Alex)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Teresa P. Britton. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Rankin, Alex)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teresa P. Britton. (Attorney Alex W Rankin added to party Teresa P. Britton(pty:pla))(aty,Rankin, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa P. Britton
Represented By: Alex W Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa P Britton
Represented By: Alex W Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?