Reese v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Reese
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01616
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Plaintiff's SSN served on U.S. Attorney, OGC, Attorney Gen on 12/24/2018, filed by Margaret Ann Reese., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Ann Reese U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 12/27/2018, answer due 3/27/2019. (aty,Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 1/4/2019 to correct answer due date (FinnSld, P).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Karl E Osterhout for Margaret Ann Reese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/18/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Leday, A)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/18/2018. (crt,Leday, A)
December 14, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3830870) by Margaret Ann Reese. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lane, Matthew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Margaret Ann Reese. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Lane, Matthew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Margaret Ann Reese. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Margaret Ann Reese(pty:pla))(aty,Lane, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ann Reese
Represented By: Matthew David Lane, Jr
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?