USA v. Harden
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: RAY HARDEN
Case Number: 3:2019cv00344
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. USA is granted a 60 day extension to complete service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/15/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of of Time by USA. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lossin, H)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ray Harden (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ray Harden (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Promissory Note, #2 Promissory Note, #3 Promissory Note, #4 Promissory Note, #5 UCC-1F, #6 UCC-3F, #7 Security Agreement, #8 Security Agreement, #9 Movable Property, #10 Affidavit, #11 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney H James Lossin, Sr added to party USA(pty:pla))(aty,Lossin, H) Modified on 3/18/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY HARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: H James Lossin, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?