Dominick v. Stone et al
Plaintiff: Willie Dominick, III
Defendant: Police Jury, Jennifer Winzer, Mike Stone and City Officer Ashcraft
Case Number: 3:2019cv00503
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Monroe Office
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT adopting #11 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge dismissing Plaintiff's claim that he was not appointed counsel within 72 hours of his arrest, as well as his remaining claims against Sheriff Stone and Police Jury. These claims are Dismissed as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief may be granted. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiff's remaining false arrest and unlawful search claims against City Officer Ashcraft and Officer Winzer are Stayed under the conditions set out in the Judgment. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/8/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Complaint and #10 Amended Complaint recommending Plaintiffs claim that he was not appointed counsel within 72 hours of his arrest, as well as his remaining claims against Sheriff Mike Stone and Police Jury, be DISMISSED as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief may be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs remaining false arrest and unlawful search claims against City Officer Ashcraft and Officer Jennifer Winzer be STAYED under the conditions listed in the R&R. Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/14/2019. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ashcraft, Mike Stone, Jennifer Winzer filed by Willie Dominick, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint. Pro Se Response due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/28/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $12.84. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/21/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled accounts officer page filed by Willie Dominick, III regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie Dominick, III. (Accounts officer page not signed. Clerk resent accounts officer page with a note stating it must be completed.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to remove deficiency on 5/21/2019 (Haik, K).
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Ashcraft, Police Jury, Mike Stone, Jennifer Winzer filed by Willie Dominick, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights complaint form, #2 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Ashcraft, Police Jury, Mike Stone, Jennifer Winzer filed by Willie Dominick, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A). Not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominick v. Stone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Jury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Winzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Officer Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Dominick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?