Charrier v. Giering et al
Plaintiff: Chery Charrier and Cheryl Charrier
Defendant: Arnold Transportation Services, Inc., American Trucking and Transportation Insurance Company, Jeffery Giering, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co, Helmsman Management Services Inc, Arnold Transportation Services Inc, Arnold Transportation and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv00652
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Watkins & Shepherd Trucking for American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co. (aty,Chauvin, Nicholas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Answer to Complaint, sent to Nicholas John Chauvin on behalf of American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/25/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co, Arnold Transportation Services Inc.(aty,Chauvin, Nicholas) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit text (Williams, L).
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co, Arnold Transportation Services Inc.(aty,Chauvin, Nicholas) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit text (Williams, L).
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co.(Attorney Nicholas John Chauvin added to party American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Chauvin, Nicholas) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit text (Williams, L).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint. Helmsman Management Services Inc's answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/9/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint, with consent by Helmsman Management Services Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Pipes, H) Modified on 7/9/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Helmsman Management Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Corporate Services L L C, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Helmsman Management Services Inc. (aty,Pipes, H)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/3/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arnold Transportation Services Inc.(aty,Chauvin, Nicholas) Modified on 6/25/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co and Jeffery Giering on 5/20/2019 in 5th JDC Richland Parish, Case Number 47014. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY, see pdf document, Attachments #3 and #4 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 20, 2019 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co, Arnold Transportation, Arnold Transportation Services Inc, Jeffery Giering, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co filed by Cheryl Charrier on 5/16/2019 in 5th JDC Richland Parish, Case Number 47014. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY, see pdf document, Attachment #3 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 6/25/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
June 20, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co, Arnold Transportation, Jeffery Giering, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co filed by Cheryl Charrier on 5/9/2019 in 5th JDC Richland Parish, Case Number 47014. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #3 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Arnold Transportation Services Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(aty,Chauvin, Nicholas) Modified on 6/25/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arnold Transportation Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Parker Global Enterprises, Inc. for Arnold Transportation Services Inc. (aty,Chauvin, Nicholas)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/23/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Guy D Perrier, Nicholas John Chauvin on behalf of Arnold Transportation Services, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 21, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 21, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 5/28/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 5th JDC Richland Parish, Case Number 47014 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3954632) filed by Arnold Transportation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, #4 Exhibit A - en globo, #5 Exhibit B - en globo, #6 List of Parties, #7 List of Pleadings)(Attorney Nicholas John Chauvin added to party Arnold Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Chauvin, Nicholas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/22/2019) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charrier v. Giering et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chery Charrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Charrier
Represented By: Myrt T Hales, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas John Chauvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Trucking and Transportation Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Giering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Trucking & Transportation Insurance Co
Represented By: Nicholas John Chauvin
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmsman Management Services Inc
Represented By: Kelsey Meeks
Represented By: H Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Transportation Services Inc
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Nicholas John Chauvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?