Ponds v. W L Bass Construction Inc
Plaintiff: Jon Ponds
Defendant: W.L. Bass Construction, Inc. and W L Bass Construction Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00711
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by W L Bass Construction Inc. (aty,Guice, Jon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W L Bass Construction Inc.(Attorney Jon Keith Guice added to party W L Bass Construction Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Guice, Jon)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Patrick Scott Wolleson on behalf of Jon Ponds regarding #3 Waiver of Service Executed, #4 Waiver of Service Executed,. Action taken: Terminated #3 Waiver of Service Returned and indicated filed in error. Reset answer due date to 08/05/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Ponds. W L Bass Construction Inc waiver sent on 6/5/2019. Answer due 8/5/2019. (aty,Wolleson, Patrick) Modified on 7/24/2019 to modify docket text to indicate correct date of mailing and correct answer due date. (Crick, S).
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Ponds. W L Bass Construction Inc waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (aty,Wolleson, Patrick) Modified on 7/24/2019 to indicate filed in error and to remove incorrect date waiver sent and incorrect answer due date. (Crick, S).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to W L Bass Construction Inc (crt,Crick, S)
June 4, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W L Bass Construction Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3964382) filed by Jon Ponds. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kermit Lamar Walters, III added to party Jon Ponds(pty:pla))(aty,Walters, Kermit) Modified on 6/5/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponds v. W L Bass Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Ponds
Represented By: Kermit Lamar Walters, III
Represented By: Patrick Scott Wolleson
Represented By: Jana Leigh Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Bass Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W L Bass Construction Inc
Represented By: Jon Keith Guice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?