Shaw v. Turtle Creek Assets Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Shaw
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets, LTD, Gordon Engle and Turtle Creek Assets Ltd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 60 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within sixty (60) days of the signing of this Order, the parties shall file a Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared in this action. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/10/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Lisa Shaw (aty,Ford, Samuel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Shaw. Turtle Creek Assets Ltd waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (aty,Ford, Samuel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Shaw. Gordon Engle waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (aty,Ford, Samuel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gordon Engle, Turtle Creek Assets Ltd (crt,Putch, A)
June 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Putch, A)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gordon Engle, Turtle Creek Assets Ltd with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3971825) filed by Lisa Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Attorney Samuel John Ford added to party Lisa Shaw)(aty,Ford, Samuel) Modified on 6/13/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Turtle Creek Assets Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Shaw
Represented By: Samuel John Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Creek Assets Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?