Sullivan v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Stephanie B Sullivan
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00806
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Stephanie B Sullivan. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA on 7/5/2019. Answer due 10/3/2019. (aty,Rankin, Alex) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit text to indicate service and answer due dates (JonesSld, P).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Miletello, A)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to file her Complaint for Judicial Review In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/26/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Stephanie B. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Rankin, Alex)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Stephanie B. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Alex W Rankin added to party Stephanie B. Sullivan(pty:pla))(aty,Rankin, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie B Sullivan
Represented By: Alex W Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?