Davis v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Tony D Davis
Defendant: Jay Russell, Pat Johnson, Donna Norman and Ouachita Correctional Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00841
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint to cure the deficienciesoutlined in the order. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment and notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/12/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $13.40. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/2/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony D Davis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 28, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENTE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony D Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,MiletelloSld, A) Application not on approved forms.
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pat Johnson, Donna Norman, Ouachita Correctional Center, Jay Russell filed by Tony D Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,MiletelloSld, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouachita Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?