Thompson v. City of Bastrop et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Thompson
Defendant: Police Dept City of Bastrop, Officer Marvin Holmes, Chief Allen Campbell, Officer Anthony evans, Officer marcus J. madison, City of Bastrop, Allen Campbell, Anthony Evans, Marvin Holmes, Sr and Marcus J Madison
Petitioner: Mr. Bobby Ray Thompson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00844
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marcus J Madison.(Attorney Elizabeth Bailly Bloch added to party Marcus J Madison(pty:dft))(aty,Bloch, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/30/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Bastrop, Allen Campbell, Anthony Evans, Marvin Holmes, Sr.(Attorney Gregory A Grefer added to parties City of Bastrop(pty:dft), Allen Campbell(pty:dft), Anthony Evans(pty:dft), Marvin Holmes, Sr(pty:dft))(aty,Grefer, Gregory) Modified docket text on 8/30/2019 (Bunting, M).
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of Bastrop, Police Dept City of Bastrop, Allen Campbell, Anthony Evans, Marvin Holmes, Sr, Marcus J Madison (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Bastrop, Police Dept City of Bastrop, Allen Campbell, Anthony Evans, Marving Holmes Sr, Marcus J Madison with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3986983) filed by Bobby Ray Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Robert B Dunlap, II added to party Bobby Ray Thompson(pty:pet))(aty,Dunlap, Robert) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. City of Bastrop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept City of Bastrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Marvin Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Anthony evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer marcus J. madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bastrop
Represented By: Gregory A Grefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Campbell
Represented By: Gregory A Grefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Evans
Represented By: Gregory A Grefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Holmes, Sr
Represented By: Gregory A Grefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus J Madison
Represented By: Elizabeth Bailly Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Bobby Ray Thompson
Represented By: Robert B Dunlap, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Thompson
Represented By: Robert B Dunlap, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?