Caraway v. Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana
Plaintiff: Angela Caraway
Defendant: Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2019cv00938
Filed: July 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Eric Bicknell, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/26/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw John E. Bicknell, Jr. as Attorney by Angela Caraway. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bicknell, John)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana answer due 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/22/2019. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Michael S Coyle added to party Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana(pty:dft))(aty,Coyle, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 21, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4003049) filed by Angela Caraway. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney John Eric Bicknell, Jr added to party Angela Caraway(pty:pla))(aty,Bicknell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caraway v. Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Caraway
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: John Eric Bicknell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Baptist Church of Ruston Louisiana
Represented By: Michael S Coyle
Represented By: Amy Josephine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?