S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C v. Givens
Plaintiff: S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C
Defendant: Matthew Givens
Case Number: 3:2019cv00963
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Matthew Givens filed by Matthew Givens. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Matthew Givens. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Matthew Givens by S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Colvin, James) Modified on 9/9/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Matthew Givens (crt,Williams, L)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/REQUEST for Entry of Default as to MATTHEW GIVENS by S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C. (aty,Colvin, James) Modified on 8/23/2019 to change motion event and to edit text (Williams, L).
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C. Matthew Givens served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (aty,Colvin, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C. (aty,Colvin, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to James H Colvin, Jr on behalf of S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Givens (crt,Williams, L)
July 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Williams, L)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Givens (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4007963) filed by SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney James H Colvin, Jr added to party SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, L.L.C.(pty:pla))(aty,Colvin, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C v. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S D S Petroleum Consultants L L C
Represented By: James H Colvin, Jr
Represented By: Cole Boyett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?