Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C v. Russ Builders L L C et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C
Defendant: Joseph Russ and Russ Builders L L C
Petitioner: Joseph G Russ, Jr
Case Number: 3:2019cv01050
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Joseph Russ answer due 12/20/2019; Russ Builders L L C answer due 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/23/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER/MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Joseph G Russ, Jr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C. Russ Builders L L C served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (aty,Chaney, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Financial Leasing Inc, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank N A, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank Co for Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C. (aty,Chaney, Mark) Modified on 8/15/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Richard A Aguilar on behalf of Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Russ, Russ Builders L L C (crt,Crick, S)
August 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against (a)Russ Builders, L.L.C., Joseph Russ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4022469) filed by Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed summons/writ Summons, #12 Proposed summons/writ Summons)(Attorney Mark James Chaney, III added to party Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Chaney, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C v. Russ Builders L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ Builders L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services L L C
Represented By: Mark James Chaney, III
Represented By: Richard A Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph G Russ, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?