Wagner et al v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Brian Wagner and Kelly Wagner
Defendant: Prompt, Inc., Brenten T. Lewis, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Igor P. Gurskiy, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Igor P Gurskiy, Safeco Insurance Co of America, Prompt Inc, Brenten T Lewis and Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2019cv01068
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania, Prompt Inc. (aty,Phayer, Dennis) Modified on 9/17/2019 to add Corporate Parents A I G Property Casualty Inc, American International Group Inc and A I G Property Casualty U S Inc for Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania (Dauterive, C).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/11/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint sent to Dennis J Phayer on behalf of Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania and Prompt Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/24/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania, Prompt Inc.(Attorney Dennis J Phayer added to party Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania(pty:dft), Attorney Dennis J Phayer added to party Prompt Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Phayer, Dennis)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of E Bragg Williams, III for Brian Wagner and Kelly Wagner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/29/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for E. Bragg Williams, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4035751) by Brian Wagner, Kelly Wagner. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Affidavit)(aty,Sterbcow, Paul)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Igor P Gurskiy, Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania, Brenten T Lewis, Prompt Inc, Safeco Insurance Co of America (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brenten T Lewis, Safeco Insurance Co of America, Igor P Gurskiy, Prompt Inc, Insurance Co of the State of Pennsylvania with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4025317) filed by Brian Wagner, Kelly Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Paul M Sterbcow added to party Brian Wagner and Kelly Wagner(pty:pla))(aty,Sterbcow, Paul) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner et al v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wagner
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Represented By: E Bragg Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Wagner
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Represented By: E Bragg Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prompt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenten T. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor P. Gurskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor P Gurskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Co of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prompt Inc
Represented By: Jonathan H Adams
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenten T Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jonathan H Adams
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?