Brookshire Grocery Co v. Pinecrest of Ruston Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brookshire Grocery Co
Defendant: Whole Life Grocer L L C and Pinecrest of Ruston Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01083
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to John Andrew Durrett on behalf of Whole Life Grocer L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Whole Life Grocer L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Andrew Durrett added to party Whole Life Grocer L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Durrett, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brookshire Grocery Co. Pinecrest of Ruston Inc waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (aty,Perkins, Marshall)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brookshire Grocery Co. Whole Life Grocer L L C waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (aty,Perkins, Marshall)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pinecrest of Ruston Inc and Whole Life Grocer L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Perkins, Marshall) Modified on 8/19/2019 to add Corporate Parent B G C Management Inc (Dauterive, C).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pinecrest of Ruston Inc and Whole Life Grocer, L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4027099) filed by Brookshire Grocery Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Marshall Louis Perkins added to party Brookshire Grocery Co(pty:pla))(aty,Perkins, Marshall) (Attachment #3 replaced with properly formatted pdf document on 8/19/2019) (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookshire Grocery Co v. Pinecrest of Ruston Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookshire Grocery Co
Represented By: L David Cromwell
Represented By: Marshall Louis Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Life Grocer L L C
Represented By: NiKayla Leann Smith
Represented By: John Andrew Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinecrest of Ruston Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?