Foster et al v. Amtrust North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Foster and Rhonda Foster
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Co, Suzzan Annette Jones and AmTrust North America Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01294
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) Report by Suzzan Annette Jones, Wesco Insurance Co Michael Foster, Rhonda Foster. (aty,Armand, Donald) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add filers (Jones, P).
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Suzzan Annette Jones, Wesco Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Production, #2 Exhibit A-Remainder of State Court Suit)(aty,Armand, Donald)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/26/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/5/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Suzzan Annette Jones, Wesco Insurance Co.(aty,Armand, Donald)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suzzan Annette Jones, Wesco Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services Inc for Wesco Insurance Co. (aty,Armand, Donald)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/7/2019. (crt,Leday, A) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text(Crawford, A).
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Thomas Alexander Pressly, IV, Donald J Armand, Jr on behalf of Wesco Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/18/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 4, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 6th JDC, East Carroll Parish, Case Number 23079 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4066991) filed by Wesco Insurance Co, Suzzan Annette Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Suit)(Attorney Donald J Armand, Jr added to party Suzzan Annette Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Donald J Armand, Jr added to party Wesco Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Armand, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. Amtrust North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Foster
Represented By: Dennis N Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Foster
Represented By: Dennis N Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Co
Represented By: Donald J Armand, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Pressly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzzan Annette Jones
Represented By: Donald J Armand, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Pressly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?