Adams et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Roger Adams, Jr., Joyce Adams and Roger Adams, Jr
Defendant: Maquis Smith, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Patriot Computer Services, LLC and Patriot Computer Services L L C
Case Number: 3:2020cv00372
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Patriot Computer Services L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith re #13 Order Requiring Submission on Jurisdictional Amount,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(aty,Atkinson, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Patriot Computer Services L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith . (aty,Atkinson, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2020 to correctly identify document (duplicate of document #14 ) (Dauterive, C).
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Patriot Computer Services L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith. (aty,Atkinson, Daniel) Modified on 5/19/2020 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Within the next 14 days from the date of this order, removing defendant is granted leave of court to file an amended notice of removal, together with supporting evidence, to establish jurisdictional amount was in controversy at the time of the removal as to the intervention. Plaintiff may submit a response (and evidence) within 7 days thereafter. Further, within the next 7 days from the date of this order, removing defendants are granted leave of court to file an amended notice of removal that establishes diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/8/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) Report by Patriot Computer Services L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith, Joyce Adams, Roger Adams Jr. (aty,Atkinson, Daniel) Modified to add filers and edit docket text on 5/8/2020 (Thomas, T).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/27/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as co-counsel Chad Curtis Carter for Joyce Adams, Roger Adams, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/15/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Enroll Chad C Carter as Counsel by Joyce Adams. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Parker, Daniel) Modified on 4/15/2020 to edit text and correct motion event (Dauterive, C).
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Patriot Computer Services L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith.(aty,Atkinson, Daniel)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Patriot Computer Services L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith . (aty,Atkinson, Daniel)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/25/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, State Court Petition exhibit filed by Patriot Computer Services, LLC, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith. (aty,Atkinson, Daniel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patriot Computer Services, LLC, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc for Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. (aty,Atkinson, Daniel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/24/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Julie Eustis Vaicius, Daniel R Atkinson, Jr on behalf of Patriot Computer Services, LLC, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/7/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 23, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 20-0624 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4217682) filed by Patriot Computer Services, LLC, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Maquis Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Complant, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Memorandum / Brief Certificate of Compliance)(Attorney Daniel R Atkinson, Jr added to party Patriot Computer Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R Atkinson, Jr added to party Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R Atkinson, Jr added to party Maquis Smith(pty:dft))(aty,Atkinson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquis Smith
Represented By: Daniel R Atkinson, Jr
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Represented By: Daniel R Atkinson, Jr
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Computer Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Atkinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Computer Services L L C
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Represented By: Daniel R Atkinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Adams
Represented By: Chad Curtis Carter
Represented By: Daniel P Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Adams, Jr
Represented By: Chad Curtis Carter
Represented By: Daniel P Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?