Elong v. Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Akame E Elong
Defendant: Dept of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00711
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Akame E Elong. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to River Correctional Center. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Henry Byrd, IV on behalf of Dept of Homeland Security (Attorney Edwin Henry Byrd, IV added to party Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft)) (aty,Byrd, Edwin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U S Attorney Gener served on 6/16/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Warden Richwood Correctional Center served 6/11/20. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney, Western District of Louisiana. (crt,Leday, A)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dept of Homeland Security, Warden, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(crt,Leday, A)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/10/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
June 4, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01466. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Case transferred to District of Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/4/2020.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/4/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Akame E. Elong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/4/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing fee received from Akame E. Elong: $ 5 (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/4/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 6/9/2020. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/4/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT**PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Akame E. Elong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elong v. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Homeland Security
Represented By: Edwin Henry Byrd, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akame E Elong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?