Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C v. Skanda Group Industries L LC et al
Plaintiff: Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC and Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Defendant: Skanda Group Industries, LLC, Nagendra Karri, Skanda HEI, LLC, Chetna Jhamb, Skanda Group Industries L L C and Skanda H E I L L C
Case Number: 3:2020cv00716
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer case, sent to George M Snellings, IV on behalf of Skanda Group Industries L L C, Skanda H E I L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/14/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (crt,Jones, P)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; MOTION to Transfer Case by Chetna Jhamb, Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group Industries L L C, Skanda H E I L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Negendra Karri, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of Chetna Jhamba)(Attorney George M Snellings, IV added to party Chetna Jhamb, Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group Industries L L C, Skanda H E I L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Snellings, George) Modified on 7/31/2020 to edit text, event and add event (Jones, P). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 7/31/2020 (Jones, P).
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C as to Skanda H E I L L C served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C as to Skanda Group Industries L L C served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C as to Nagendra Karri served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C as to Skanda Group of Industries L L C served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 6/10/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C as to Chetna Jhamb served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chetna Jhamb, Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group Industries L L C, Skanda H E I L L C. (crt,Jones, P)
June 5, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Jones, P)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skanda Group Industries L L C, Skanda H E I L L C, Nagendra Karri, Chetna Jhamb with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4284681) filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC.(Attorney Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr added to party Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 6/8/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C v. Skanda Group Industries L LC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanda Group Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagendra Karri
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanda HEI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetna Jhamb
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanda Group Industries L L C
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanda H E I L L C
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Represented By: Joseph D Guerriero
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?