Holland v. Dollar General Corp et al
Plaintiff: Joe Ann Holland
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co, Dollar General Corporation and Dollar General Corp
Case Number: 3:2020cv00957
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Sule Douglas Busari on behalf of Joe Ann Holland regarding #12 Rule 26(f) Report. Action taken: Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 26.5, FRCP5(d), and Standing Order 1.15; local and federal rules do not allow routine filing of discovery, including disclosures and subpoenas under Rule 26. No further action on part of counsel is required. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR - INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Joe Ann Holland. (aty,Busari, Sule) Modified to reflect electronically filed in error on 9/9/2020 (Bunting, M).
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Dollar General Corp . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record)(aty,Hadley, Maxwell)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, 2nd floor before Judge Terry A Doughty. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2021. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 2/25/2021. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 3/26/2021. Defendants Witness List due by 4/6/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 4/9/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/26/2021. Discovery deadline 4/26/2021. Expert Depositions due by 5/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 8/17/2021. Motions in Limine due by 8/13/2021. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/24/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/20/2020. (jud,Hayes, Karen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Jointly filed RULE 26(f) Report by Dollar General Corp and Plaintiff, Joe Ann Holland. (aty,Hadley, Maxwell) Modified filers on 8/20/2020 (Bunting, M).
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's State Court Petition for Damages and #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Dollar General Corp. (aty,Davies, Trevor)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/26/2020. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/5/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/31/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar General Corp.(aty,Davies, Trevor)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dollar General Corp (aty,Hadley, Maxwell)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/30/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 29, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Jones, P)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 6th JDC Madison Parish, Case Number 20-106 with Jury Demand; (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Dollar General Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Maxwell Connor Hadley added to party Dollar General Corporation(pty:dft))(aty,Hadley, Maxwell) Modified on 7/29/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
July 29, 2020 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by Dollar General Corporation. ( Filing Fee: $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4337167) . (aty,Hadley, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Dollar General Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ann Holland
Represented By: Sule Douglas Busari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Trevor Charles Davies
Represented By: Maxwell Connor Hadley
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corp
Represented By: Trevor Charles Davies
Represented By: Maxwell Connor Hadley
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?