Holloway v. Gates et al
Plaintiff: William Warren Holloway, IV
Defendant: Austin Blackman, Dusty Gates, Warden Adams and Victor E Lee
Case Number: 3:2020cv01077
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT adopting #8 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge dismissing Plaintiff's claims, with respect to his requests for injunctive relief, as moot; dismissing Plaintiff's claims, with respect to his requests for monetary compensation as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/25/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations by William Warren Holloway, IV. Response to Objection to R&R due by 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint and #7 Amended Complaint. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims, with respect to his request for injunctive relief, be DISMISSED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims, with respect to his request for monetary compensation, be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/10/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/2/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adams, Dusty Gates, Victor E Lee filed by William Warren Holloway, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William Warren Holloway, IV. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint, within 30 days of the filing of this Order, to cure the deficiencies outlined. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/21/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $9.0. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/20/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Warren Holloway, IV. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Adams, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Proposed order) (Devillier, W).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams, Austin Blackman, Dusty Gates, Victor E Lee filed by William Warren Holloway, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Gates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor E Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Warren Holloway, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?