Hutchinson v. Great West Casualty Co et al
Plaintiff: Damien Hutchinson
Defendant: Vantapro Speciality Insurance Co, Jimmie Brown, J L S Transport, Great West Casualty Co and J L S Transportation L L C
Case Number: 3:2020cv01265
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J L S Transport. (aty,McAllister, Sean)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint, by J L S Transport.(Attorney Sean Michael McAllister added to party J L S Transport(pty:dft))(aty,McAllister, Sean) Modified to edit docket text on 10/6/2020 (Thomas, T).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/28/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/25/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 24, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 24, 2020 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jimmie Brown, Great West Casualty Co, J L S Transport, Vantapro Speciality Insurance Co filed by Damien Hutchinson in the 4th JDC, Parish of Ouachita. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jimmie Brown, Great West Casualty Co.(aty,McAllister, Sean)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of State Court Record by Jimmie Brown, Great West Casualty Co re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(aty,McAllister, Sean)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great West Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp, Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group Inc, Corporate Parent ORI Great West Holdings, Inc. for Great West Casualty Co. (aty,McAllister, Sean)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1447 by Jimmie Brown, Great West Casualty Co re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings)(aty,McAllister, Sean)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC, Ouachita Parish, Case Number 20-1872 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4399380) filed by Great West Casualty Co, Jimmie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Sean Michael McAllister added to party Jimmie Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Michael McAllister added to party Great West Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,McAllister, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Great West Casualty Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantapro Speciality Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Brown
Represented By: Sean Michael McAllister
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L S Transport
Represented By: Sean Michael McAllister
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Co
Represented By: Sean Michael McAllister
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L S Transportation L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Hutchinson
Represented By: Christian C Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?