Chambless Enterprises L L C et al v. Redfield et al
Plaintiff: Chambless Enterprises L L C and Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Nina Witkofsky, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, William Pelham Barr and Alex M Azar, Jr
Amicus Curiae: National Medical Association, Danya E Kenne, Emily A Benfer, Childrens Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, National Hispanic Medical Association, Michael Z Levy, George Consortium, Gregg Gonsalves, Kathryn M Leifheit, David Vlahov, American Medical Association, Craig E Pollack, Sabriya L Linton, American Academy of Pediatrics, Gabriel L Schwartz, Southeast Louisiana Legal Services, Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, Julia Raifman, G L M A, Peter Hepburn, Public Health Law Watch and Acadiana Legal Service Corp
Case Number: 3:2020cv01455
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Myers, Steven) Modified on 1/8/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
January 5, 2021 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc and Chambless Enterprises L L C Alex M Azar, Jr served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; William Pelham Barr served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Centers for Disease Control & Prevention served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Dept of Health & Human Services served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Nina Witkofsky served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event which calculates appropriate answer due date. See pdf document filed as #39 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 5, 2021 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , filed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Exhibit)(aty,Rather, James)
January 5, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C Declaration of Service (aty,Rather, James)
December 31, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky of Congressional Action (aty,Vigen, Leslie)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/22/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 22, 2020 Filing 35 RULING re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chambless Enterprises L L C, Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/22/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 15, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/15/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 14, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Support of Pltfs Motion for Prelim Injunction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 14, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Support of Pltfs Motion for Prelim Injunction by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Erin Babich Runge, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Simpson, Steven)
December 9, 2020 Filing 31 AMICUS BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Acadiana Legal Service Corp, Southeast Louisiana Legal Services. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/9/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 9, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Emily A Benfer, Childrens Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, G L M A, George Consortium, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya E Kenne, Kathryn M Leifheit,, Michael Z Levy, Sabriya L Linton, Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Craig E Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L Schwartz, David Vlahov. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 9, 2020 Filing 28 AMICUS BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Childrens Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, G L M A, George Consortium, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya E Kenne, Kathryn M Leifheit,, Michael Z Levy, Sabriya L Linton, Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Craig E Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L Schwartz, David Vlahov, Emily A Benfer. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified on 12/9/2020 (Thomas, T).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief and file brief in excess of page limitation. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/9/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 8, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #25 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 8, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acadiana Legal Service Corporation, Southeast Louisiana Legal Services. (aty,Williams, David)
December 8, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction with consent by Southeast Louisiana Legal Services, Acadiana Legal Service Corporation. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Amicus Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney David H Williams added to party Southeast Louisiana Legal Services(pty:am))(aty,Williams, David)
December 8, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Childrens Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, G L M A, George Consortium, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya E Kenne, Kathryn M Leifheit,, Michael Z Levy, Sabriya L Linton, Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Craig E Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L Schwartz, David Vlahov, Emily A Benfer. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Finger, Davida) Modified to correct filer on 12/8/2020 (Thomas, T). Modified on 12/9/2020 (Thomas, T).
December 8, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus with consent (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/8/2020.) by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Childrens Healthwatch, Matthew Desmond, G L M A, George Consortium, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya E Kenne, Kathryn M Leifheit,, Michael Z Levy, Sabriya L Linton, Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Craig E Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L Schwartz, David Vlahov, Emily A Benfer. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading Amicus, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Financial Disclosures)(Attorney Davida Finger added to party Davida Finger (pty:selreq))(aty,Finger, Davida) Modified to remove erroneously chosen motion event, edit docket text and to correct filer on 12/8/2020 (Thomas, T). Modified on 12/9/2020 (Thomas, T).
December 8, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crawford, A)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/8/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 8, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #23 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus with consent . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/7/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
December 7, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Leave to file 35-page opposition memorandum, due December 7). Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 7, 2020 Filing 20 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky regarding #18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Leave to file 35-page opposition memorandum, due December 7) . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Exhibit A - Tiger Lily Opinion, #2 Proposed Exhibit B - KBW Order)(aty,Myers, Steven) Modified to reflect documents are proposed on 12/8/2020 (Thomas, T).
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency to Steven A Myers on behalf of Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky regarding #18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Leave to file 35-page opposition memorandum, due December 7). Reason: A motion for leave to file must be accompanied by the proposed pleading. The court will not act on such a motion without reviewing the document sought to be filed. Please refer to LR 7.6 for more information. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Leave to file 35-page opposition memorandum, due December 7) by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Myers, Steven) Modified to reflect deficient status on 11/30/2020 (Thomas, T). Modified to remove deficient status and reflect proposed pleading filed as document #20 on 12/8/2020 (Thomas, T).
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Terry A Doughty: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/18/2020. Defendant's response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is due by 12/7/2020. Plaintiff's may reply by 12/14/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A Myers on behalf of Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky (Attorney Steven A Myers added to party Alex M Azar, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party William Pelham Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party Robert Redfield(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party Nina Witkofsky(pty:dft)) (aty,Myers, Steven)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen on behalf of Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky (Attorney Leslie Cooper Vigen added to party Alex M Azar, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Cooper Vigen added to party William Pelham Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Cooper Vigen added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Cooper Vigen added to party Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Cooper Vigen added to party Robert Redfield(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Cooper Vigen added to party Nina Witkofsky(pty:dft)) (aty,Vigen, Leslie)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Ethan W Blevins for Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/16/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Hannah S Marcley for Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/16/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Steven M Simpson for Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/16/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Luke A Wake for Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/16/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for ETHAN BLEVINS to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467365) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for HANNAH MARCLEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467364) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for STEVEN SIMPSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467363) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for LUKE WAKE to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467361) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY: re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chambless Enterprises L L C, Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc. A telephone Status Conference is set for 11/18/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Terry A Doughty. Call-in information will be provided by email. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/13/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declarations of Joshua Chambless and Tammy Esponge, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (aty,Rather, James)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky, Dept of Health & Human Services, William Pelham Barr, Alex M Azar Jr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to James C Rather, Jr on behalf of Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/27/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky, Dept of Health & Human Services, William Pelham Barr, Alex M Azar, Jr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention (Filing fee $400, receipt number BLAWDC-4465424) filed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons to Azar, #3 Summons to Barr, #4 Summons to CDC, #5 Summons to HHS, #6 Summons to Redfield, #7 Summons to Witkofsky, #8 Chambless Corporate Disclosure)(Attorney James C Rather, Jr added to party Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc.(pty:pet), Attorney James C Rather, Jr added to party Chambless Enterprises L L C(pty:pet))(aty,Rather, James) Modified to edit docket text on 11/12/2020 (Thomas, T).
November 12, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambless Enterprises L L C et al v. Redfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control & Prevention
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Witkofsky
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Redfield
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, Jr
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chambless Enterprises L L C
Represented By: James C Rather, Jr
Represented By: Steven M Simpson
Represented By: Hannah S Marcley
Represented By: Luke Anthony Wake
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc
Represented By: James C Rather, Jr
Represented By: Steven M Simpson
Represented By: Hannah S Marcley
Represented By: Luke Anthony Wake
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Medical Association
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Danya E Kenne
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emily A Benfer
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Childrens Healthwatch
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Matthew Desmond
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Medical Association
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Z Levy
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George Consortium
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gregg Gonsalves
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathryn M Leifheit
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Vlahov
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Craig E Pollack
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sabriya L Linton
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gabriel L Schwartz
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southeast Louisiana Legal Services
Represented By: Walter P McClatchey, Jr
Represented By: David H Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Julia Raifman
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: G L M A
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Hepburn
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: William P Quigley
Represented By: Davida Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Acadiana Legal Service Corp
Represented By: Walter P McClatchey, Jr
Represented By: David H Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?