Lott v. Kryukov et al
Plaintiff: Richard E Lott
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company, Progressive Insurance Agency Inc, Vyacheslav Kryukov, New Route, Inc., United Financial Casualty Co and New Route Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01509
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Order, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Richard E Lott. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint)(aty,Pendley, Patrick)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Party ; granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/21/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiff to submit a proposed amended complaint that properly invokes and sets forth the court's diversity jurisdiction. Within the next 7 days from the date of this order, plaintiff is granted leave of court to supplement his motion with a signed amended complaint that redresses the jurisdictional deficiencies identified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/21/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
January 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of No Opposition by Vyacheslav Kryukov, New Route Inc, Progressive Insurance Agency Inc, United Financial Casualty Co re #15 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION to Amend Complaint (aty,Jarrell, Allison) Modified docket text on 1/20/2021 (Bunting, M).
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Party, MOTION to Amend Complaint with consent by Richard E Lott. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (First Amended Complaint), #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pendley, Patrick) Modified on 1/20/2021 to edit text and add event (Jones, P). Added MOTION to Amend/Correct on 1/20/2021 (Jones, P).
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE First Amended Notice of Removal by United Financial Casualty Co re #13 Order, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Lucinda O. Page)(aty,Snellings, George)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Within the next 7 days from the date of this order, removing defendant(s) is granted leave to file an amended #1 Notice of Removal that establishes diversity jurisdiction at the time of removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/13/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Route Inc. (aty,Snellings, George) Modified filers on 1/8/2021 (Bunting, M).
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vyacheslav Kryukov, New Route Inc, United Financial Casualty Co.(aty,Snellings, George)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Rule 26(f) Report, sent to George M Snellings, IV on behalf of New Route Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/12/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by United Financial Casualty Co, Vyacheslav Kryukov, New Route Inc and Richard E Lott. (aty,Snellings, George) Modified filers on 12/29/2020 (Bunting, M).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Charles Austin Gower for Richard E Lott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/15/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Austin Gower to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4502454) by Richard E Lott. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pendley, Patrick)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Financial Casualty Co. Progressive Commercial Holdings Inc corporate parent to United Financial Casualty Co; Progressive Corp corporate parent to Progressive Commercial Holdings Inc. (aty,Snellings, George) Modified to add corporate parents on 12/7/2020 (Bunting, M).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/1/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/30/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to George M Snellings, IV on behalf of United Financial Casualty Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/14/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 25, 2020 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, by United Financial Casualty Company. (aty,Snellings, George)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 20-2781 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4481534) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney George M Snellings, IV added to party United Financial Casualty Company(pty:selreq))(aty,Snellings, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. Kryukov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E Lott
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: Patrick W Pendley
Represented By: Austin Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vyacheslav Kryukov
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Represented By: Allison M Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Route, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Co
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Represented By: Allison M Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Route Inc
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Represented By: Allison M Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?