LeBlanc v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Michael C LeBlanc
Defendant: Major Chase, Warden Anderson and Major Farmer
Case Number: 3:2021cv00083
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
2 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/31/2021. Clerk manually noticed Accounts Officer with Accounts Officer Page and order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (crt,Thomas, T)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Michael C LeBlanc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Taylor, L)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 2/16/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form)(crt,Leday, A)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 12, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael C LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/12/2021. (crt,Adams, K). Application/Motion not on approved form.
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anderson, Chase, Farmer filed by Michael C LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBlanc v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?