Sebhatleab v. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Fithawi Teklay Sebhatleab
Defendant: U S Dept of Homeland Security, Field Office Director Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Secretary U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement and U S Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2021cv00222
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
2 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBITS in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (crt,Leday, A)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Justifiable Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and those documents are filed in the record in support of pending petition. To the extent Petitioner moves for "justifiable judgment" in his favor at this time, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/11/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Justifiable Judgment by Fithawi Teklay Sebhatleab. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. U S Attorney General answer due 3/22/2021; Secretary U S Dept of Homeland Security answer due 3/22/2021; U S Dept of Homeland Security answer due 3/22/2021; Field Office Director Immigration & Customs Enforcement answer due 3/22/2021; U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement answer due 3/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/24/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by U S Attorney General, Secretary U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Field Office Director Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party U S Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party Secretary U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party Field Office Director Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(aty,Williams-Auzenne, Desiree)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U S Attorney General served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U S Attorney, served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney General, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U S Attorney and Warden on 2/2/21. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts)(crt,Leday, A)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/1/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
January 28, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Fithawi Teklay Sebhatleab in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635065171. (crt,Chavis, J)
January 26, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fithawi Teklay Sebhatleab. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Letters of reference)(crt,Chavis, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebhatleab v. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Homeland Security
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary U S Dept of Homeland Security
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Attorney General
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fithawi Teklay Sebhatleab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?