Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co Ltd v. Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Plaintiff: Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co Ltd
Defendant: Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Case Number: 3:2021cv00409
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
2 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #29 Motion for Claim Construction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 5/4/2021 (crt,Bunting, M)
April 13, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 5/4/2021 (crt,Bunting, M)
April 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 , #29 . Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 13, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #29 , #17 . Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Garrett Barten for Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/25/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Elissa Tisdahl for Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/25/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
March 24, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Garrett Ari Barton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4617896) by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Elissa Ann Tisdahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4617875) by Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Chiaviello, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/19/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 18, 2021 Filing 37 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 18, 2021 Filing 36 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-25010. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 18, 2021 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING TALBOT'S #23 MOTION TO TRANSFER Closing Case. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (Barten, Garrett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Potential Witnesss Table)(Barten, Garrett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 2/5/2021. (Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER HOLDING THE COURTS RULING ON #29 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING IN ABEYANCE. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 29 Defendant's MOTION for Claim Construction Hearing by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (Tisdahl, Elissa) Modified event type on 2/11/2021 (dgj). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference held on 1/15/2021 before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck, 1-18 pages, Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5634 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2021. (ilz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER staying #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Re: #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Response due by 2/4/2021 Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER HOLDING THE COURT'S RULING;Staying #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Abraham J. Hakim)(Barten, Garrett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: and MINUTE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/15/2021, Telephone Conference held on 1/15/2021. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 22 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Elissa Ann Tisdahl, Robert M. Chiaviello, Jr, Hartwell P. Morse, III, Garrett Ari Barten, Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu, David Silver, Andrew Scott Rapacke. Defendant SHALL file a Motion for Claim Construction Hearing (10-page maximum) on or before Friday, January 22, 2021. Plaintiff SHALL file a Response to the Motion for Claim Construction Hearing on or before Friday, January 29, 2021. Defendant SHALL file a Reply on or before Wednesday, February 3, 2021. Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5634 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (as02) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 1/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hakim Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer)(Barten, Garrett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER, Order Setting Telephone Conference for Friday, 1/15/2021 at 01:10 PM (Eastern Time) in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled teleconference time so that the teleconference may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For clarity, please do not use a cell phone or a speaker phone. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/14/2021. (as02) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Jianbo Yang for Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd. (Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Christopher & Weisberg, P.A., Other Affiliate Elissa A. Tisdahl, Other Affiliate Garrett A. Barten, Other Affiliate Louise H. Moore, Other Affiliate Abraham J. Hakim, Other Affiliate Abraham N. Hakim, Other Affiliate Leah H. Goldenberg, Other Affiliate Jackie A. Hakim, Other Affiliate Joseph D. Hakim, Other Affiliate Kay H. Lahasky, Other Affiliate Hannah H. Jones, Other Affiliate Steven Ariel, Other Affiliate Nuby Law, Other Affiliate Robert M. Chiaviello, Other Affiliate Hartwell Morse for Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC (Barten, Garrett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re #18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC (Tisdahl, Elissa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Summer Ye, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garrett Ari Barten on behalf of Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Attorney Garrett Ari Barten added to party Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Barten, Garrett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OMNIBUS ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert M. Chiaviello Jr.; Granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Robert M. Chiaviello Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hartwell Morse. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14146668 by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Tisdahl, Elissa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert M. Chiaviello Jr.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14146109. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Tisdahl, Elissa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Answer due 1/19/2021. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Attorney Elissa Ann Tisdahl added to party Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Tisdahl, Elissa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David Silver. It is ORDERED that David Silver, may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiff Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co. Ltd.; the Clerk SHALL provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to him at david@bayramoglu-legal.com. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2020. (as02) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu. It is Ordered that Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiff Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co. Ltd; the Clerk SHALL provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to him at deniz@bayramoglulegal.com. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2020. (as02) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Silver. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14008613 by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14008603 by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.] (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/18/2021) (Bunting, M).
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Talbot's Pharmaceuticals Family Products, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14000375, filed by Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Rapacke, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/18/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co Ltd v. Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talbots Pharmaceuticals Family Products L L C
Represented By: Hartwell Powell Morse, III
Represented By: Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr
Represented By: Garrett Ari Barten
Represented By: Elissa Ann Tisdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiamen Baby Pretty Products Co Ltd
Represented By: Andrew Scott Rapacke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?