Manyweather et al v. Woodlawn Manor Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kimmieko Manyweather, Arthur Manyweather, Felix Manyweather, Alison Tucker, Timothy Manyweather, Estate of Barbara Jean McGraw, Emanami Kirk and Barbara Jean McGraw Estate
Defendant: Woodlawn Manor, Inc. dba The Oaks, Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust and Woodlawn Manor Inc doing business as Oaks
Case Number: 3:2021cv01317
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice filed by Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust, Woodlawn Manor Inc. (aty,Matthews, Laura)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice filed by Emanami Kirk, Arthur Manyweather, Felix Manyweather, Kimmieko Manyweather, Timothy Manyweather, Barbara Jean McGraw Estate, Alison Tucker. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as this relief was mistakenly selected by filer. The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #13 is GRANTED, and the opposition to the #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim is now due by 6/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/18/2021. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice with consent sought but not yet obtained , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice with consent sought but not yet obtained (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2021.) by Emanami Kirk, Arthur Manyweather, Felix Manyweather, Kimmieko Manyweather, Timothy Manyweather, Barbara Jean McGraw Estate, Alison Tucker. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency to Jeffrey D Guerriero on behalf of Emanami Kirk, Arthur Manyweather, Felix Manyweather, Kimmieko Manyweather, Timothy Manyweather, Barbara Jean McGraw Estate, Alison Tucker regarding #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice with consent sought but not yet obtained . Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice with consent sought but not yet obtained by Emanami Kirk, Arthur Manyweather, Felix Manyweather, Kimmieko Manyweather, Timothy Manyweather, Barbara Jean McGraw Estate, Alison Tucker. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/17/2021. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey) Modified to reflect deficient status on 6/17/2021 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted on 6/17/2021 (Bunting, M).
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust, Woodlawn Manor Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(aty,Matthews, Laura)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 CORRECTED NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 6/17/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim ALL CLAIMS MOTION to Dismiss ALL CLAIMS. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. Responses due by 6/16/2021 (crt,Bunting, M)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice by Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust, Woodlawn Manor Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Berger, #3 Exhibit B - 85 F.R. 15198, #4 Exhibit C -85 F.R. 21012-02, #5 Exhibit D - 85 F.R. 35100-01, #6 Exhibit E- 85 F.R. 79190-01, #7 Exhibit F - DHHS Advisory Opinion May 19, 2020, #8 Exhibit G - August 14, 2020 Letter from DHHS Counsel, #9 Exhibit H - DHHS Guidance Memo August 13, 2020, #10 Exhibit I - DHHS Advisory Opinion October 23, 2020, #11 Exhibit J - DHHS Advisory Opinion January 8, 2021)(aty,Matthews, Laura) Modified docket text on 5/26/2021 (Bunting, M). Modified text on 5/27/2021 (Reeves, T).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 5/20/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
May 19, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Laura Beth Matthews on behalf of Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust, Woodlawn Manor Inc regarding #4 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement. Action taken: Docket text modified to reflect issued in error. Corporate Disclosure Statements have already been submitted. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 ISSUED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Laura Beth Matthews on behalf of Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust, Woodlawn Manor Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/2/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) Modified on 5/20/2021 to indicate issued in error (Miletello, A).
May 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust. (aty,Matthews, Laura)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodlawn Manor Inc. (aty,Matthews, Laura) Modified docket text on 5/19/2021 (Miletello, A).
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number C-20211108 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4676716) filed by Woodlawn Manor Inc, Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit)(Attorney Laura Beth Matthews added to party Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust(pty:dft), Woodlawn Manor Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Matthews, Laura) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/18/2021) (Miletello, A). Modified on 5/19/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manyweather et al v. Woodlawn Manor Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodlawn Manor, Inc. dba The Oaks
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Nursing Home Association Liability Trust
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Represented By: David R Sobel
Represented By: Nathan Windham Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodlawn Manor Inc doing business as Oaks
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Represented By: David R Sobel
Represented By: Nathan Windham Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimmieko Manyweather
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Manyweather
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Manyweather
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Tucker
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Manyweather
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Barbara Jean McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanami Kirk
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Jean McGraw Estate
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?