Louisiana et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Arizona, State of Alabama, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, Commonwealth of Kentucky and State of Ohio
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, U.S. Dept of Health and Human Services, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and U S Dept of Health & Human Services
Case Number: 3:2021cv03970
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Responses due by 2/8/22, should the Court deny the pending Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/11/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 11, 2022 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, with consent by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McElvain, Joel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 41 MINUTE ENTRY: Government response as to #40 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings is due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/7/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 6, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #40 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
January 6, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,McElvain, Joel)
December 20, 2021 ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #31 Notice of Appeal, is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking #here. (USCA #21-30734)If you do not have access to the Electronic Download Feature of CM/ECF, please submit your request for the certified record on appeal to the District Court. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
December 15, 2021 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM ORDER of USCA as to #31 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services that the opposed motion for stay of the district court's preliminary injunction order pending appeal filed by Appellants Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, HHS, Mr. Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Ms. Chiquita Brooks-Lasure is DENIED insofar as the order applies to the 14 Plaintiff States. A stay is GRANTED as to the order's application to any other jurisdiction. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Thomas T Hydrick for State of South Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/3/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
December 3, 2021 USCA Case Number 21-30734 for #31 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
December 2, 2021 Set Deadline for Clerk re #31 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record (21-30734) by Clerk to COA 12/17/2021. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Thomas M Fisher for State of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/2/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
December 2, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Thomas T. Hydrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4913636) by State of South Carolina. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #32 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/1/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lindsay S See for State of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/1/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
December 1, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Thomas M. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4911714) by State of Indiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay re #29 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #28 Memorandum Ruling, Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,McElvain, Joel)
December 1, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #28 Memorandum Ruling, by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) (aty,McElvain, Joel)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Marc Edwin Manley for Commonwealth of Kentucky. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/30/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
December 1, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #32 MOTION to Stay re #29 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #28 Memorandum Ruling, Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/30/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 30, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM RULING re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Louisiana, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Arizona, State of Mississippi, State of Utah, State of Idaho, State of Georgia, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/30/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 30, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Lindsay S. See to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4910469) by State of West Virginia. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff States. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/30/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 29, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Reply to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
November 29, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Reply to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 11/30/2021 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Expedite Consideration. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/29/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 29, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on Written Submissions by State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy). Added MOTION to set Response date in error on 11/29/2021 (Crawford, A).
November 29, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/29/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 29, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #22 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on Written Submissions. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
November 26, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Crick, S)
November 26, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,McElvain, Joel) Modified on 11/29/2021 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text.(Crick, S).
November 26, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Kossak on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services (Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Chiquita Brooks-Lasure(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft)) (aty,Kossak, Jonathan)
November 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services (Attorney Julie Straus Harris added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Straus Harris added to party Chiquita Brooks-Lasure(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Straus Harris added to party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Straus Harris added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft)) (aty,Harris, Julie)
November 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Drezner on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services (Attorney Michael Drezner added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Drezner added to party Chiquita Brooks-Lasure(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Drezner added to party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Drezner added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft)) (aty,Drezner, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L McElvain on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services (Attorney Joel L McElvain added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L McElvain added to party Chiquita Brooks-Lasure(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L McElvain added to party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L McElvain added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft)) (aty,McElvain, Joel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Marc Manley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4904707) by Commonwealth of Kentucky. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (crt,Crick, S)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Joinder to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Ohio (aty,Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 11/23/2021 to modify docket text.(Crick, S).
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services filed by State of Utah, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of South Carolina, State of Georgia, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Ohio.(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified on 11/23/2021 to modify docket text.(Crick, S).
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Utah, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of South Carolina, State of Georgia U S Dept of Health & Human Services served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,St John, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2021 to modify date of service. (Crick, S).
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Utah, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of South Carolina, State of Georgia Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,St John, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2021 to modify date of service. (Crick, S).
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Utah, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of South Carolina, State of Georgia Chiquita Brooks-Lasure served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,St John, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2021 to modify date of service. (Crick, S).
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Utah, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of South Carolina, State of Georgia Xavier Becerra served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,St John, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2021 to modify date of service. (Crick, S).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff States promptly serve Government Defendants with the Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Government Defendants file a Response to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Friday, November 26, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., CST. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff States file a Reply to the Response by Wednesday, December 1, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., CST. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #5 Minute Entry dated November 16, 2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/17/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 *VACATED* MINUTE ENTRY: Plaintiff States are to promptly serve Defendants Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, and Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services with the Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Upon receipt, Defendants may file a Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction within fifteen (15) days. Plaintiff States may file a Reply five (5) days after Defendants files their Response. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/16/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) Modified on 11/17/2021 to indicate vacated, see #6 Memorandum Order (Miletello, A).
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (crt,Crick, S)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 ISSUED IN ERROR. SUMMONS ISSUED as to Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 11/16/2021 to indicate issued in error. #4 USA Summons issued. (Crick, S).
November 16, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #3 Summons Issued - All,. Action taken: Modified text to indicate issued in error. #4 Correct summons issued. (crt,Crick, S)
November 15, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Elizabeth Baker Murrill on behalf of State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia regarding #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Action taken: Terminated TRO event added in error to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (crt,Crick, S)
November 15, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of West Virginia. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 11/16/2021 (Crick, S). Modified on 11/18/2021 to removed Motion for TRO - added in error. (Crick, S).
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4895438) filed by State of Utah, State of Indiana, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of Oklahoma, State of West Virginia, State of Mississippi, State of Alabama, State of South Carolina, State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Alabama(pty:pla), Attorney State of Arizona(pty:pla), State of Georgia(pty:pla), State of Idaho(pty:pla), State of Indiana(pty:pla), State of Louisiana(pty:pla), State of Mississippi(pty:pla), State of Montana(pty:pla), State of Oklahoma(pty:pla), State of South Carolina(pty:pla), State of Utah(pty:pla), State of West Virginia(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/16/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Scott St John
Represented By: Josiah Kollmeyer
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Thomas Tyler Hydrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Scott St John
Represented By: Josiah Kollmeyer
Represented By: Marc Edwin Manley
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Scott St John
Represented By: Josiah Kollmeyer
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Joel L McElvain
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-Lasure
Represented By: Joel L McElvain
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Joel L McElvain
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Joel L McElvain
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?