Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co v. McConnell et al
Plaintiff: Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Company and Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co
Defendant: Clay McConnell, Rhonda McConnell, Michael Conroy and Nicole Conroy
Case Number: 3:2022cv00194
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clay McConnell, Michael Conroy, Nicole Conroy by Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co. (aty,Armand, Donald) Modified on 2/9/2022 to more accurately describe pleading and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Meredith Price Bro for Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co. Attorney Marshall Louis Perkins terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 2/2/2022. (crt,Tice, Y)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/27/2022. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Meredith P. Bro in place of Marshall L. Perkins with consent by Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Statement, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Armand, Donald)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Conroy, Nicole Conroy, Clay McConnell, Rhonda McConnell. (crt,Crick, S)
January 24, 2022 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Complaint. A refund of the initial payment of $402.00, ALAWDC-4969130, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
January 21, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4969135) filed by Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Petition, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Marshall Louis Perkins added to party Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Company(pty:pla))(aty,Perkins, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co v. McConnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshall Louis Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unitrin Safeguard Insurance Co
Represented By: Donald J Armand, Jr
Represented By: Marshall Louis Perkins
Represented By: Meredith Price Bro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?