Sawyer v. Stinson et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Caleb Sawyer
Defendant: Chris Stinson, Tommy Farmers, Jane Doe and Lt Fletcher
Case Number: 3:2022cv00602
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Caleb Sawyer. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (No accounts officer page. Clerk resent accounts officer page with a note stating it must be completed.) (Attachments: #1 Letter re accounts officer page, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, Tommy Farmers, Fletcher, Chris Stinson filed by Matthew Caleb Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2)(crt,Haik, K)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/15/2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Application)(crt,Leday, A)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/15/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 2, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified on 3/14/2022 (Devillier, W).
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Caleb Sawyer. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter regarding Statement of Account, #2 Envelope)(crt,Williams, K)). Motion/Application not on approved form.
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, Tommy Farmers, Fletcher, Chris Stinson filed by Matthew Caleb Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Williams, K). Complaint not on approved form. (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/14/2022) (Devillier, W).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Stinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Caleb Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Farmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?