Mitchell v. Madison Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Jabarre Mitchell
Defendant: Madison Correctional Center, Sheriff Office Madison Parish, James Leblanc and James Lablanc
Case Number: 3:2022cv06044
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jabarre Mitchell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (No accounts officer page. Clerk resent page 6 with a note stating it must be completed.) (Attachments: #1 Letter re accounts officer page, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against James Lablanc, Madison Correctional Center, Sheriff Office Madison Parish filed by Jabarre Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/9/2023) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form, #2 Complaint Form)(crt,Leday, A)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/7/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 21, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:22-cv-00697. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/21/2022. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 11/21/2022.]
October 5, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 11/21/2022.]
October 3, 2022 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 11/21/2022.]
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jabarre Mitchell (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 11/21/2022.]
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James LeBlanc, Madison Correctional Center, Madison Parish Sheriff Office, filed by Jabarre Mitchell.(NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 11/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Madison Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabarre Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Office Madison Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leblanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lablanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?