Ford v. Dolgencorp L L C et al
Plaintiff: Linda Ford
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC, Dollar General, DG Louisiana LLC, Dolgencorp L L C doing business as Dollar General and D G Louisiana L L C doing business as Dollar General
Case Number: 3:2023cv01384
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as co-counsel Charles H Heck, Jr for Linda Ford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/30/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION for Charles Heck Jr and The Heck Firm LLC to Enroll as Counsel by Linda Ford. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Charles H Heck, Jr added to party Linda Ford(pty:pla))(aty,Heck, Charles)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Michael Robert Creighton on behalf of Linda Ford. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 11/1/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 17, 2023 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (4th JDC, Morehouse Parish, #2023-121, filed 4/25/2023) by D G Louisiana L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #9, Response to Removal Order.(crt,Miletello, A)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by D G Louisiana L L C (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete State Court Record)(aty,Ballero, Michael) Modified on 10/18/2023 to more accurately identify pleading (Miletello, A).
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/6/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/6/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DG Louisiana LLC, Dolgencorp LLC. (aty,Ballero, Michael)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DG Louisiana LLC, Dolgencorp LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for Dolgencorp LLC; Corporate Parent Dolgencorp, L L C for DG Louisiana LLC. (aty,Ballero, Michael)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/4/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Michael Louis Ballero on behalf of DG Louisiana LLC, Dolgencorp LLC. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/18/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Michael Louis Ballero on behalf of DG Louisiana LLC, Dolgencorp LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/18/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 3, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC, Parish of Morehouse, Case Number 2023-121 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5712934) filed by DG Louisiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Envelope B - Pl Responses to Discovery)(Attorney Michael Louis Ballero added to party DG Louisiana LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Ballero, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Dolgencorp L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ford
Represented By: Charles H Heck, Jr
Represented By: Michael Robert Creighton
Represented By: Christian C Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Louisiana LLC
Represented By: Michael Louis Ballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp L L C doing business as Dollar General
Represented By: Michael Louis Ballero
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Represented By: Trevor Charles Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D G Louisiana L L C doing business as Dollar General
Represented By: Michael Louis Ballero
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Represented By: Trevor Charles Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?