Brownfield v. Dolgencorp L L C et al
Plaintiff: Paula Brownfield
Defendant: Dolgencorp L L C doing business as Dollar General, D G Louisiana L L C doing business as Dollar General and A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2024cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 2/13/2024. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/23/2024. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 10, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by D G Louisiana L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(aty,Turnage, John)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/8/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D G Louisiana L L C. (aty,Turnage, John)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D G Louisiana L L C. (aty,Turnage, John)
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/5/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John C Turnage on behalf of D G Louisiana L L C, Dolgencorp L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 1/19/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #2 Answer to Complaint, sent to John C Turnage on behalf of D G Louisiana L L C, Dolgencorp L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/19/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by D G Louisiana L L C and Dolgencorp L L C.(aty,Turnage, John) Modified to add filer on 1/5/2024 (Whitener, M).
January 2, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Whitener, M)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC - Morehouse Parish, Case Number 2023-439 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5806842) filed by D G Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney John C Turnage added to party DG Louisiana, LLC(pty:selreq))(aty,Turnage, John) Modified docket text on 1/5/2024 (Whitener, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownfield v. Dolgencorp L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Brownfield
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp L L C doing business as Dollar General
Represented By: John C Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D G Louisiana L L C doing business as Dollar General
Represented By: John C Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?