Beasley v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C et al
Plaintiff: Denitra Beasley
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and Wal-Mart Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv01260
Filed: September 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 Filing 18 Reacted Attachment 7 to #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct by Denitra Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Attachment 8)(crt,Crick, S)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Redacted Attachments 7 & 8 to Motion to Remand #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/7/2024. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal Previously Filed Document re: #13 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Attachments 7 & 8 to #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct , #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/7/2024. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
November 7, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Denitra Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, Walmart Policies, cont., #2 Exhibit H, Redacted Deposition Transcript of Shawn Caldwell)(aty,Downs, Hayden)
November 5, 2024 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Attachments 7 & 8 to #10 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 PROPOSED Redacted Attachment 7, #4 PROPOSED Redacted Attachment 8)(aty,Downs, Earl) Modified on 11/6/2024 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 5, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Attachments 7 & 8 to #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memoradum in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Downs, Earl) Modified on 11/6/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 31, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Wal-Mart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Wolf, Scott)
October 10, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 10/31/2024 (crt,Crick, S)
October 10, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Amend/Correct with opposition (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/10/2024.) by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading Exhibit A, Proposed First Supplemental Complaint, #4 Exhibit B, Walmart Job Description, #5 Exhibit C, Walmart Policies, #6 Exhibit D, Correspondence, #7 SEALED Exhibit E, Deposition of Shawn Caldwell, #8 SEALED Exhibit F, Deposition of Kathy Torres)(aty,Downs, Hayden) Modified on 10/10/2024 to modify motion event. (Crick, S). Modified on 11/6/2024 to modify docket text and to indicate #13 Motion to Seal has been submitted. (Crick, S). Modified on 11/8/2024 to modify docket text and to indicate #18 Redacted Attachment 7 & 8 submitted. (Crick, S).
September 18, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C . (aty,Wolf, Scott)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/17/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
September 17, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C.(aty,Wolf, Scott)
September 17, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parents, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mrat Stores East L P, W S E Management L L C, Wal-Mart Stores East L L C for Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified on 9/17/2024 to add corporate parents and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
September 17, 2024 Filing 5 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott)
September 16, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/16/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
September 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Hayden Sierra Downs, Scott R Wolf on behalf of Denitra Beasley, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 9/30/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
September 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/30/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
September 14, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Wal-Mart Inc answer due 9/23/2024; Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C answer due 9/23/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
September 14, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)
September 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Morehouse Parish, Case Number 2024-330 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6057763) filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Wal-Mart Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Wolf, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denitra Beasley
Represented By: Emily Wynn Downs
Represented By: Earl Ross Downs, Jr
Represented By: Earl Ross Downs, III
Represented By: Hayden Sierra Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Scott R Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc
Represented By: Scott R Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?