Reddick v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Terry Reddick
Defendant: Walmart Inc, Yiwu Jiexin Electronic Commerce Co Ltd, Sellers Union Group, A B C Insurance Co, X Y Z Insurance Co and Techmilly Co Ltd
Case Number: 3:2024cv01298
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as additional counsel Quincy T Crochet for Walmart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/5/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
November 4, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Quincy T. Crochet to Enroll as Counsel by Walmart Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Clute, Matthew)
October 22, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 11/12/2024 (crt,Miletello, A)
October 21, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(aty,Clute, Matthew) Modified docket text on 10/22/2024 (Miletello, A).
October 8, 2024 Filing 9 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (aty,Clute, Matthew)
October 8, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC (LP), Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Walmart Business Real Es, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Walmart Inc. (aty,Clute, Matthew)
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Walmart Inc answer due 10/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/30/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
September 27, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Walmart Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order - Motion for Extension of Time)(aty,Clute, Matthew) Modified motion event & docket text on 9/30/2024 (Miletello, A).
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/25/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
September 24, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2024. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 24, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Matthew Zane Clute on behalf of Walmart Inc AND to Jeffrey D Guerriero on behalf of Terry Reddick. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/8/2024. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 24, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Matthew Zane Clute on behalf of Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/8/2024. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 23, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Walmart Inc answer due 9/30/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 23, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 2024-2987 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6065690) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit "B" Service and Citation, #3 Exhibit "C" Email of January 30, 2024, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew Zane Clute added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Clute, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddick v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Quincy T Crochet
Represented By: Matthew Zane Clute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Jiexin Electronic Commerce Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellers Union Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techmilly Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Reddick
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Creekmore
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?