Green v. Circle K Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Green
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc and D S Holdings L L C
Case Number: 3:2024cv01315
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Remand , filed by James Green. (aty,Carter, Chad) Modified to remove docket entry relationship and edit text on 11/12/2024 (Thomas, T).
November 5, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Remand filed by Circle K Stores Inc, D S Holdings L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J, #2 Exhibits A-J, #3 Exhibits A-J, #4 Exhibits A-J, #5 Exhibits A-J)(aty,Harpole, John) Modified to remove duplicate text on 11/5/2024 (Thomas, T).
October 22, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned notified counsel of a waivable conflict, but I have been notified that all waivers were not returned. Accordingly, I must recuse. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/21/2024. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
October 15, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 First MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 11/5/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 14, 2024 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand by James Green. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order, #4 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Carter, Chad)
October 14, 2024 Filing 9 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Green. (aty,Carter, Chad)
October 14, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Circle K Stores Inc identifying Corporate Parent Couche Tard US Inc & Subsidaries for Circle K Stores Inc. (aty,Harpole, John)
October 14, 2024 Filing 7 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Circle K Stores Inc. (aty,Harpole, John)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/3/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Circle K Stores Inc, D S Holdings L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Pleadings filed in the state court proceeding, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Counsel)(aty,Harpole, John)
October 1, 2024 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Circle K Stores Inc, D S Holdings L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #2 of document #5 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Thomas, T)
September 30, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/30/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John David Harpole on behalf of Circle K Stores Inc, D S Holdings L L C AND Chad Curtis Carter on behalf of James Green. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 30, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John David Harpole on behalf of Circle K Stores Inc, D S Holdings L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 25, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 4tj JDC, Ouachita Parish, Case Number 20241045 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6068421) filed by DS Holdings LLC, Circle K Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit North La Ortho & Sports Medicine Clinic, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Records, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Records, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Records, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Records, #9 Exhibit Executed HIPPA, #10 Exhibit Fax Confirmation, #11 Exhibit Correspondence with PC, #12 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #13 Exhibit Notice of Ownership Change)(Attorney John David Harpole added to party Circle K Stores Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John David Harpole added to party DS Holdings LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Harpole, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Circle K Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc
Represented By: Summer Whittington
Represented By: John David Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D S Holdings L L C
Represented By: Summer Whittington
Represented By: John David Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Green
Represented By: Kevin D Alexander
Represented By: Chad Curtis Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?