Davis v. USA

Case Number: 5:2006cv00158
Filed: January 27, 2006
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6702 IRS: Refund of Income Tax Penalty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 97 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 98 Motion for New Trial; denying 99 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 4/17/09. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 7, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 110 Motion to Stay Judgment and to Fix the Amount of Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 7/7/09. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 6, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 118 MOTION for Installment Payment Order and Imposition of Ten-Percent Surcharge filed by USA. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/6/2011. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.