Cook v. Shreveport et al

Defendant: City of Shreveport, Police Dept of Shreveport, Paul Robinson, John Doe and Red River Entertainment of Shreveport Partnership in Commendam
Petitioner: Stuart Cook
Case Number: 5:2010cv00809
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 9/2/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 31, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 82 MOTION for Reconsideration re 76 Memorandum Ruling Granting City Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Stuart Cook. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/31/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 19, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Red River Entertainment of Shreveport Partnership in Commendam, denying as moot 67 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence and Reference to Same at Trial filed by Red River Entertainment of Shreveport Partnership in Commendam. All of Cook's claims against Sam's Town are dismissed. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/19/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 18, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Shreveport, Pat Hensley, F Mogavero, Paul Robinson. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/18/2011. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 12, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Cook's wage loss claim is Dismissed. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/12/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Shreveport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red River Entertainment of Shreveport Partnership in Commendam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stuart Cook
Represented By: Johnny E Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?