Weems v. Hodnett et al

Plaintiff: Tanya McLain Weems
Defendant: James David Hodnett, Maynard, Clark & Teasley, Inc., John Elba Arnold, IV, Arnold Insurance Group, Louisiana Department of Insurance, L.K. Hartsfield and Ryan Curtis
Case Number: 5:2010cv01452
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James David Hodnett, Maynard Clark & Teasley Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/31/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 25, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 32 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's supplemental responses and production are due by 8/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/25/11. (crt,Delgado, S)
July 13, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 38 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/13/11. (crt,Delgado, S) Modified on 7/13/2011 to edit document type (Delgado, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weems v. Hodnett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya McLain Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James David Hodnett
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maynard, Clark & Teasley, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Elba Arnold, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.K. Hartsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?