Barnes et al v. Commerce & Industry Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie L Barnes and James Barnes
Defendant: Commerce & Industry Insurance Co and American International Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2011cv00041
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: For the foregoing reasons, C & I's 73 motion with respect to the testimony of G. Randolph Rice, Ph.D., is DENIED. C & I's motion with respect to the testimony of Patrick Thomas, CPA, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. C & I 's motion with respect to the testimony of Robert Thornton, M.D., is DENIED AS MOOT. C & I's motion with respect to the testimony regarding treatment that Dr. Barnes received in California is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 11/20/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)
November 20, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: For all the foregoing reasons, the statements of Aaron Aud and Thomas Harwell in the police report are inadmissible hearsay and Barnes's 71 motion in limine to exclude those statements from evidence is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 11/19/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)
June 11, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs' 42 motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' 24 motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court's order granting the defendants' 37 motion for partial summary judgment is VACATED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 6/11/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)
January 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING for the reasons set forth, C & I's 24 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and Barnes's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 1/18/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Commerce & Industry Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie L Barnes
Represented By: Henry Howard Lemoine, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Barnes
Represented By: Henry Howard Lemoine, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce & Industry Insurance Co
Represented By: Douglas M Chapoton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Insurance Co
Represented By: Douglas M Chapoton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?