Meshell v. Schindler Elevator Corp

Plaintiff: David Meshell and Peggy Meshell
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corp and Horseshoe Entertainment
Case Number: 5:2011cv00536
Filed: April 5, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 54 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 6/21/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 19, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 37 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Deadlines; terminating as moot 36 Motion to Strike Expert Witness and 45 Motion to Strike Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/19/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 26, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER permitting Defendants to file an Amended Notice of Removal. (Compliance Deadline set for 6/17/2011 for filing Amended Notice of Removal). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/26/11. (crt,Whidden, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meshell v. Schindler Elevator Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corp
Represented By: James Gowen Washburn
Represented By: Christopher J Aubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horseshoe Entertainment
Represented By: Samuel W Caverlee
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth LeBato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Meshell
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Meshell
Represented By: Jeffrey D Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?