Boswell v. Claiborne Parish Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Donald M Boswell
Defendant: Claiborne Parish Detention Center, Johnny Sumlin, John Goodwin, James Banks and Staff Claiborne Parish Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2011cv00739
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting 99 Report and Recommendations. It is ordered that all remaining claims against all defendants are Dismissed with Prejudice. All claims against all parties have now been resolved. This is a final judgment. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 8/9/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 15, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting in part 70 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 12/15/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 5, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting 36 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss 31 is granted and that all claims against the Claiborne Parish Detention Center and Staff of Claiborne Parish Detention Center be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 4/5/2016. (crt,Joffrion, B)
September 30, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 14 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/30/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boswell v. Claiborne Parish Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald M Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claiborne Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Sumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Claiborne Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?