Browder et al v. X T O Energy Inc

Plaintiff: Barbara Sue Browder, Darryl Keith Browder, Ruby Sue Browder, Lonta Browder and Angela Browder
Defendant: X T O Energy Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01428
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' claims against Clay Bate Robinson are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 5/22/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 12, 2013 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 71 Anadarko's Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Anadarko are hereby dismissed with prejudice. XTO's Motion to Dismiss [Record Document 67] is GRANTED, and all claims against XTO are hereby dismissed with prej udice. Beverly Miller's adopted motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and all claims against Beverly Miller are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The following motions are DENIED: [Record Documents 79,81,85,87,89,92,93,98,100,108,113-116,119,124,126,135-142,143-149,153-166]. Any other pending motions by Plaintiffs directed towards Anardarko or XTO are likewise DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/11/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 19, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: XTO and Anadarkos motions for a more definite statement [Record Documents 4, and 45] are GRANTED. Anadarkos previous Motion for a More Definite Statement [Record Document 25] is DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiffs have until 3/30/2012 to fil e a concise and clear statement of their claims. Anadarkos Amended Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 8(a) [Record Document 45] is DENIED. Anadarkos previous Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 8(a) [Record Document 25] is DENIED as MOOT. Anadarkos Am ended Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) [Record Document 45] is DENIED, and Anadarkos previous Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) [Record Document 25] is DENIED as MOOT.Plaintiffs have until 4/6/2012 to properly serve Anadarko. Pla intiffs motion to strike Anadarkos motions [Record Document 29] is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct Case [Record Document 36] is also DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Jury Trial [Record Document 28] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/19/2012. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browder et al v. X T O Energy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X T O Energy Inc
Represented By: Ashley S Green
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Randazzo, III
Represented By: Robert R Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Sue Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Keith Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Sue Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonta Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?