Black v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Harold Joe Black
Defendant: James LeBlanc, Concordia Parish Detention Center, Randell Maxwell, J Levy Dabadie Correctional Center, Winn Correctional Center, David Wade Correctional Center, Terry Terrelle, Jerry Goodwin and Peggy E Landry
Case Number: 5:2011cv01714
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2017 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 157 Motion to Show Excusable Neglect & Good Cause for Failure to Timely Appeal. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/24/2017. (crt,Haik, K)
November 17, 2016 154 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING adopting Report and Recommendations; granting 131 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 137 Motion to Stay; denying 138 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against James LeBlanc and Jerry Goodwin are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/17/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
April 6, 2016 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Motion for Reconsideration re 116 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 4/6/2016. (crt,Haik, K)
May 7, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 81 Report and Recommendations, 1 Complaint, filed by Harold Joe Black IT IS ORDERED that all claims against the remaining defendants in this civil action are dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 5/7/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
August 13, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 78 Report and Recommendations; denying 53 Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/13/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 9, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 63 Report and Recommendations; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED that Secretary James LeBlanc's Motion to Dismiss is granted and all claims against LeBlanc are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/9/2013. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Joe Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concordia Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randell Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Levy Dabadie Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wade Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Terrelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy E Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?